This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/18/2020 at 04:55:39 (UTC).

Eberhardt VS Alta Mira Club

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 Eberhardt filed a Labor - Wage Claim lawsuit against Alta Mira Club. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KARIN S SCHWARTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1900

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wage Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EBERHARDT , ALMA

Defendant

ALTA MIRA CLUB

Other

LABOR COMMISSIONER, STATE OF CALIFORNIA; DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZEME, SUSAN WINER

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

2/18/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

2/18/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

2/18/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement - Dropped

2/18/2020: Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement - Dropped

Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 04/07/2020 02:00 PM D- 106

12/19/2019: Hearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 04/07/2020 02:00 PM D- 106

Hearing Reset to Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement 02/18/2020 02:00 PM D- 106

12/23/2019: Hearing Reset to Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement 02/18/2020 02:00 PM D- 106

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

11/26/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement Filed

11/20/2019: Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement Filed

Notice of Representation of Plaintiff and Respondent Filed

11/14/2019: Notice of Representation of Plaintiff and Respondent Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Labor Commissioner, State of Californi

11/18/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Labor Commissioner, State of Californi

Appeal of Labor Commissioner Filed

11/4/2019: Appeal of Labor Commissioner Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alta Mira Club

11/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alta Mira Club

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

11/4/2019: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement Filed by Alta Mira Club

11/4/2019: Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement Filed by Alta Mira Club

Civil Court Trial 02/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 511

11/4/2019: Civil Court Trial 02/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 511

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Waiver of Bond Requirement - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement 02/18/2020 02:00 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 04/07/2020 02:00 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Court Trial 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement 02/13/2020 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Defendant's Motion for Waiver of Bond Requirement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Trial Date Filed for Labor Commissioner, State of Californi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Representation of Plaintiff and Respondent Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 02/04/2020 01:30 PM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketMotion for Waiver of Bond Requirement 12/05/2019 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Waiver of Bond Requirement Filed by Alta Mira Club

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Alta Mira Club

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal of Labor Commissioner Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEME, SUSAN WINER