This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/23/2020 at 00:40:29 (UTC).

Eat Pleasanton CA Senior Livi VS Arbor Building Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2018 Eat Pleasanton CA Senior Livi filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Arbor Building Group, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAUL D. HERBERT and BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8246

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

PAUL D. HERBERT

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SUNRISE PLEASANTON CA SENIOR LIVING, LLC

EAT PLEASANTON CA SENIOR LIVING, LP

DIABLO PLUMBING, INC.

CWP CABINETS, INC.

S&S DRYWALL, INC.

ARIES BUILDING

JAMES HOUSE

LIAS MECHANICAL, INC.

BLAZONA CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION, INC.

SOCAL LIEN SOLUTIONS, LLC

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ARBOR BUILDING GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VAN-ORNUM, ANDREW J

WENGER, KATHERINE F

HERNS, DANIEL G

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 08/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

3/28/2018: Initial Case Management Conference 08/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/6/2018: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Motion Granted

1/15/2019: Motion Granted

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

12/11/2018: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for S&S Drywall, Inc.

9/20/2018: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for S&S Drywall, Inc.

Order to Consolidate Cases and Appointing Special Master Filed

9/21/2018: Order to Consolidate Cases and Appointing Special Master Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

9/24/2018: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Rejection Letter Issued on Answer to Cross-Complaint

9/10/2018: Rejection Letter Issued on Answer to Cross-Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Eat Pleasanton CA Senior Living, LP

3/23/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Eat Pleasanton CA Senior Living, LP

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

3/23/2018: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

3/28/2018: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arbor Building Group, Inc. Filed

3/29/2018: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Arbor Building Group, Inc. Filed

Motion to Strike Filed by Arbor Building Group, Inc.

4/20/2018: Motion to Strike Filed by Arbor Building Group, Inc.

Notice of Unavailability Filed

5/29/2018: Notice of Unavailability Filed

Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant

7/13/2018: Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Defendant

Motion to Strike - Dropped

7/20/2018: Motion to Strike - Dropped

Answer to Complaint Filed for Arbor Building Group, Inc.

8/6/2018: Answer to Complaint Filed for Arbor Building Group, Inc.

Summons Issued and Filed

8/6/2018: Summons Issued and Filed

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Other Contract; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Other Contract; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketHearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 01/15/2019 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint 12/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 11/27/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion for Attorney Fees 11/02/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Extending Time to Respond to Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike Reservation Set for dept: 20 date: 06/28/2018 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketMotion to Strike Hearing Confirmed for 06/21/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike Filed by Arbor Building Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Arbor Building Group, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/07/2018 03:00 PM D- 20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Eat Pleasanton CA Senior Living, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Contract Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where James House is a litigant

Latest cases where DIABLO PLUMBING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where S&S Drywall, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BLAZONA CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant