This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/24/2021 at 20:14:11 (UTC).

Eastern Funding LLC VS FZ Global Investment, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/10/2020 Eastern Funding LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FZ Global Investment, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3815

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

EASTERN FUNDING LLC

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

FZ GLOBAL INVESTMENT, INC.

MOHAMED ARAHIMI, FAHAD MOHAMED

KIBRECK, ZENEBECH

ARAHIMI, FAHAD M. MOHAMED

Cross Defendants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

EASTERN FUNDING LLC

FZ GLOBAL INVESTMENT, INC.

MOHAMED ARAHIMI, FAHAD MOHAMED

KIBRECK, ZENEBECH

BLEDNYH, GREGORY

GSLS LAUNDRY ACQUISITIONS, LLC

DOES 1-25, INCLUSIVE

ARAHIMI, FAHAD M. MOHAMED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

BROWN, MICHAEL W

MOGHADDAMI, ALI R.

STIMPERT ESQ, MARC R.

CHUANG ESQ, HENRY

STEIN, DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

7/30/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/26/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

4/21/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Initial Case Management Conference 04/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

1/4/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 04/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/3/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Demurrer to Cross-Complaint - Overruled

9/3/2021: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint - Overruled

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

9/3/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Granted

9/3/2021: Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Granted

Eastern Funding's Reply in Support of Demurrer to Cross-Complaint of FZ Global/Kibret Filed

8/26/2021: Eastern Funding's Reply in Support of Demurrer to Cross-Complaint of FZ Global/Kibret Filed

Case Management Statement of Eastern Funding LLC Filed

7/21/2021: Case Management Statement of Eastern Funding LLC Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

7/23/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Gregory Blednyh

7/23/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Gregory Blednyh

Case Management Statement of Fahad M. Mohamed Arahimi Filed

7/20/2021: Case Management Statement of Fahad M. Mohamed Arahimi Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

7/20/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for GSLS Laundry Acquisitions, LLC

7/8/2021: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for GSLS Laundry Acquisitions, LLC

96 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint;; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Demurrer to Cross-Complaint; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Cross-Complaint - Overruled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEastern Funding's Reply in Support of Demurrer to Cross-Complaint of FZ Global/Kibret Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 10/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
136 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketApplication for Right to Attach Order and Writ of Attachment Hearing Confirmed for 04/02/2021 02:00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Eastern Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EASTERN FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DAVID A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STIMPERT ESQ, MARC R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chuang, Henry