Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/11/2020 at 05:43:46 (UTC).

East Bay Restaurant Supply, I VS Tank Wines LLC, a Limited L

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 East Bay Restaurant Supply, I filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Tank Wines LLC, a Limited L. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KARIN S SCHWARTZ. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7247

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

KARIN S SCHWARTZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EAST BAY RESTAURANT SUPPLY, INC.

Defendant

TANK WINES LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

6/5/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Attempted Proof of Service Filed

6/3/2020: Attempted Proof of Service Filed

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 106

5/20/2020: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 106

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

6/3/2020: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

6/3/2020: Claim of Plaintiff Dismissed

Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 05/20/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

3/11/2020: Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 05/20/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Request Re: Postponement Granted

3/10/2020: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Request Re: Postponement Filed for East Bay Restaurant Supply, Inc.

3/6/2020: Request Re: Postponement Filed for East Bay Restaurant Supply, Inc.

Attempted Proof of Service Filed

2/26/2020: Attempted Proof of Service Filed

Attempted Proof of Service Filed

2/7/2020: Attempted Proof of Service Filed

Request Re: Postponement Filed for East Bay Restaurant Supply, Inc.

1/16/2020: Request Re: Postponement Filed for East Bay Restaurant Supply, Inc.

Request Re: Postponement Granted

1/22/2020: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 03/18/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

1/23/2020: Hearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 03/18/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

12/16/2019: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

12/16/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Karin S Schwartz; Department: Dept 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttempted Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 06/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 05/20/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for East Bay Restaurant Supply, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttempted Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttempted Proof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Postponed to Small Claims Court Trial 03/18/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for East Bay Restaurant Supply, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 01/29/2020 01:30 PM D- 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST BAY RESTAURANT SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant