This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/14/2021 at 06:27:52 (UTC).

Dusen VS State Bar of California

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Dusen filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State Bar of California. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4305

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUSEN, JAN VAN

Defendants

ESQUEDA, EDWARD

LAWRENCE, MELANIE

STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA

LAUBSCHER, TERESE

HENDERSON, ROBERT A.

GOLDADE, TERRIE

CARLUCCI, JOSEPH

ROQUE, JENNIFER

LEE, JASON P.

PASTERNAK, DAVID J.

STEEDMAN, DONALD

SAUCEDO, JAMIE

ABELSON, HEATHER

MOAWAD, STEVEN

KIM, JAYNE

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

8/6/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Declaration OF SUZANNE C. GRANDT REGARDING MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS Filed

8/6/2020: Declaration OF SUZANNE C. GRANDT REGARDING MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS Filed

Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Filed by State Bar of California

8/11/2020: Demurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Filed by State Bar of California

Case Management Statement of State Bar of California Filed

8/17/2020: Case Management Statement of State Bar of California Filed

Case Management Statement of Jan Van Dusen Filed

8/27/2020: Case Management Statement of Jan Van Dusen Filed

Proof of Service - Request for Dismissal Filed

9/1/2020: Proof of Service - Request for Dismissal Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

9/3/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

9/9/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

First Amended Complaint Filed

6/19/2020: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

6/19/2020: Summons Issued and Filed

Case Management Statement of Jan Van Dusen Filed

7/6/2020: Case Management Statement of Jan Van Dusen Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/8/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/19/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 04/06/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

11/22/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/06/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Complaint - Civil Rights Filed

11/21/2019: Complaint - Civil Rights Filed

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDemurrer and Motion to Strike Complaint Hearing Dropped from dept: 25 date: 09/11/2020 time: 09:00 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Request for Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion to Amend Complaint 09/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMotion to Amend Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 25 date: 09/23/2020 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Jan Van Dusen Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/29/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/08/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/06/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jan Van Dusen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE BAR OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant