This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/11/2021 at 02:11:56 (UTC).

Durkee VS CYC Engineering, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2019 Durkee filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CYC Engineering, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4240

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DURKEE, LISA

Defendants

LEE & ASSOCIATES GROUP OF COMPANIES

TRIWICK DEVELOPMENT, LLC

RAPTOR SERIES BY CYC ENGINEERING, INC.

CYC ENGINEERING, INC.

CHI, YUNG JEN

DOE, PETER

PEARSON, DOUG

FRIEDMAN, BRYAN

DOE, ERIK

NG, PETER YIM-MING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHILD, ERIK E.

BERGSTROM, EMILY D.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/8/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/8/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/4/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bryan Friedman Filed

12/24/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Bryan Friedman Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Triwick Development, LLC Filed

12/24/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Triwick Development, LLC Filed

Case Management Statement of Lisa Durkee Filed

2/1/2021: Case Management Statement of Lisa Durkee Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Peter Yim-Ming Ng

8/27/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Peter Yim-Ming Ng

Answer to Complaint Filed for Bryan Friedman

8/27/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Bryan Friedman

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

8/27/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Declaration of Diligence Filed

6/8/2020: Declaration of Diligence Filed

Declaration of Diligence Filed

6/8/2020: Declaration of Diligence Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

11/22/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/22/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 521; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment Reservation Set for dept: 521 date: 05/26/2022 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/11/2022 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/22/2022 02:00 PM D- 301

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 07/01/2022 08:30 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Lisa Durkee Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: CYC Engineering, Inc., Erik Doe, Yung Jen Chi Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party CYC Engineering, Inc., Erik Doe, Yung Jen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/07/2020 01:30 PM D- 507

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Durkee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LEE & ASSOCIATES COMMERCIAL REAL ESTATE SERVICES INC.-CITY OF INDUSTRY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILD, ERIK E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERGSTROM EMILY D.