Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/24/2021 at 01:53:43 (UTC).

Dominguez VS 3m Company

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 Dominguez filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3m Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JO-LYNNE Q. LEE. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4514

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DOMINGUEZ , SILVIA

DOMINGUEZ , FERNANDO

DOMINGUEZ, SILVIA

DOMINGUEZ, FERNANDO

Defendants

3M COMPANY

LORENTZEN COMPANY

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY

CROWN CORK & SEAL INC

HILL BORTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

CBS CORPORATION

JT THORPE AND SONS INC

CRANE CO.

HILL BROTHERS CHEMICAL COMPANY

VIACOM CBS INC.,

FRASER BOILER SERVICE, INC

J&H MARINE

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

PARKER HANIFFIN CORPORATION

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DEBLASE, PATRICK

BLAIR, LYNNE P.

FITZPATRICK, JENNIFER D

SHELDON, CHARLES T.

CHAVES, MARISA R.

DAVIS, GEOFFREY

BOONE, MORDECAI D

PRINDLE, KENNETH B.

JAMISON, KEVIN D

MCCLAIN, FLORENCE A

PRZETAK, LAURA

CORMIER, JENNIFER A.

WILLIAMSON, IAN G

CUNNINGHAM, JAMES P.

GLASPY, DAVID M

BASSI, MARTE J.

TALARICO, AMY J

SCHATZ, RUSSELL W.

PIETRYKOWSKI, MICHAEL J

POND, FRANK D.

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

1/19/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/13/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

11/8/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Permit filing Of Anwser In Intervention

10/13/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Permit filing Of Anwser In Intervention

Order Granting Stipulation to Permit Filing of Answer in Intervention to Complaint Filed

10/26/2020: Order Granting Stipulation to Permit Filing of Answer in Intervention to Complaint Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Immediate Release of Union Records

8/19/2020: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Immediate Release of Union Records

Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PREMIT FILING OF ANSWER IN INTERVENTION TO COMPLAINT BY INTERVENORS

7/10/2020: Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO PREMIT FILING OF ANSWER IN INTERVENTION TO COMPLAINT BY INTERVENORS

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

6/12/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

6/4/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

5/11/2020: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

3/9/2020: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Union Carbide Corporation

2/25/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Union Carbide Corporation

Order and Stipulation Authorizing Electronic Service Filed

2/11/2020: Order and Stipulation Authorizing Electronic Service Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for JT Thorpe and Sons Inc

1/30/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for JT Thorpe and Sons Inc

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Union Carbide Corporation Filed

1/14/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Union Carbide Corporation Filed

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal Filed for General Electric Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Goodrich Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/14/2021 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Fernando Dominguez, Silvia Dominguez Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Designated Defense Counsel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Jo-Lynne Q. Lee; Department: Dept 18

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Crane Co. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Crown Cork & Seal Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to General Electric Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Union Carbide Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Hill Borthers Chemical Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 02/07/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Fernando Dominguez

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LORENTZEN COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where VIACOM CBS INC., is a litigant

Latest cases where JT THORPE AND SONS INC is a litigant