This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 16:45:12 (UTC).

Doe VS Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 08/10/2018 Doe filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES REILLY, JEFFREY BRAND and FRANK ROESCH. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6237

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES REILLY

JEFFREY BRAND

FRANK ROESCH

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Other

DOE , JOHN

Respondent and Debtor / Appellee

REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HATHAWAY, MARK M.

MILLER, JANATHAN D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/15/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference 11/07/2018 09:00 AM D- 511

8/13/2018: Case Management Conference 11/07/2018 09:00 AM D- 511

Return on Writ from Filed

11/15/2019: Return on Writ from Filed

Proof of Service by Hand Delivery re: Judgment Granting Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate

10/10/2019: Proof of Service by Hand Delivery re: Judgment Granting Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate

Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Writ of Mandate As to Regents of the University of Califor

10/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service on Petition for Writ of Mandate As to Regents of the University of Califor

Judgment Entire Action Filed

9/18/2019: Judgment Entire Action Filed

Copy of Writ Issued Filed

9/18/2019: Copy of Writ Issued Filed

Proposed Judgment Received

8/12/2019: Proposed Judgment Received

Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

5/24/2019: Civil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

Petition for Writ of Mandate Granted

5/24/2019: Petition for Writ of Mandate Granted

Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Writ of Mandamus Filed

5/17/2019: Reply Brief in Support of Motion for Writ of Mandamus Filed

Respondents Amended Statement Regarding Official Court Reporter Filed

5/6/2019: Respondents Amended Statement Regarding Official Court Reporter Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Brief Filed

5/7/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Brief Filed

Respondent's statement regarding official court reporter Filed

4/5/2019: Respondent's statement regarding official court reporter Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

4/23/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Granted

Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Regents of the University of California

4/22/2019: Stipulation and Order Re: Continuance of Hearing Filed for Regents of the University of California

Petitioner's Opening Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed

4/11/2019: Petitioner's Opening Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed

Notice of Change of Firm Name and Contact Information Filed

3/28/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name and Contact Information Filed

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn on Writ from Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service on Petition for Writ of Mandate As to Regents of the University of Califor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Hand Delivery re: Judgment Granting Petition for Writ of Administrative Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy of Writ Issued Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Judgment Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Writ of Mandate; Judge: Frank Roesch; Department: Dept 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Demurrer Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Regents of the University of California Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 11/08/2018 09:00 AM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • DocketDemurrer Hearing Confirmed for 11/08/2018 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Petition for Writ of Mandamus Filed by Regents of the University of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Regents of the University of California Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 11/07/2018 09:00 AM D- 511

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Doe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER JONATHAN DENGLER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HATHAWAY MARK M.