Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/29/2021 at 00:08:10 (UTC).

Doe VS Parish

Case Summary

On 02/25/2020 Doe filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Parish. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EVELIO GRILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5763

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

EVELIO GRILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOE , JOHN

Defendants

ORDER

DIOCESE

PARISH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MONES, PAUL

BONAGOFSKY, SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/27/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/4/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/4/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

1/25/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed

1/26/2021: Notice of Continuance of Case Management Conference Filed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

3/8/2021: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Case Management Statement of Order Filed

5/12/2021: Case Management Statement of Order Filed

Case Management Statement of Order Filed

2/18/2021: Case Management Statement of Order Filed

Case Management Statement of John Doe Filed

2/18/2021: Case Management Statement of John Doe Filed

Case Management Statement of Parish, Diocese, Order Filed

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement of Parish, Diocese, Order Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Diocese Filed

6/22/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Diocese Filed

Proposed Order Received

5/11/2020: Proposed Order Received

Notice of Change of Address Filed

5/15/2020: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Proposed Order Received

5/11/2020: Proposed Order Received

Proposed Order Received

5/11/2020: Proposed Order Received

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/25/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

2/25/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 15; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 10/26/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of John Doe Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Evelio Grillo; Department: Dept 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/27/2021 01:30 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 15 date: 05/19/2020 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Seal Record - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • DocketMotion to Seal Record Hearing Confirmed for 04/21/2020 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Seal Record Filed for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/26/2021 03:00 PM D- 15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for John Doe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARISH is a litigant

Latest cases where Orders of a General & Continuing Nature is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONAGOFSKY, SCOTT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONES, PAUL