This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/26/2020 at 13:01:00 (UTC).

Doan VS American Water Heater Service Inc

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Doan filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against American Water Heater Service Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RONNI MACLAREN and JAMES REILLY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7056

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

RONNI MACLAREN

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARTINEZ, MICHAEL

DOAN, TRI

ESCANO, JOSE

CULPEPPER, KEITH JR

HINKLE, AARON

THAYN, ERIC

RIVERA, IVAN

Defendants

MILLS, STEVE

AMERICAN WATER HEATER SERVICE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

HAWES, BRIAN E.

BOUTRIS, BASIL J.

BURNS, WILLIAM F.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

7/16/2020: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/26/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/9/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

(*Email Notification of Settlement by PLT to Dept. 302 on 06/09/20*) Filed

6/9/2020: (*Email Notification of Settlement by PLT to Dept. 302 on 06/09/20*) Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for Tri Doan, Ivan Rivera, Eric Thayn, Jose Escano, Aaron Hinkle, Keith C

6/12/2020: Notice of Settlement Filed for Tri Doan, Ivan Rivera, Eric Thayn, Jose Escano, Aaron Hinkle, Keith C

Substitution of Attorney Filed for American Water Heater Service Inc

7/11/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for American Water Heater Service Inc

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Steve Mills

7/11/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Steve Mills

Letter re Mediator Selection Filed

7/17/2019: Letter re Mediator Selection Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

6/11/2019: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Case Management Statement of Tri Doan, Ivan Rivera, Eric Thayn, Jose Escano, Aaron Hinkle, Keith Cul

6/17/2019: Case Management Statement of Tri Doan, Ivan Rivera, Eric Thayn, Jose Escano, Aaron Hinkle, Keith Cul

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/1/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/1/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

First Amended Complaint Filed

4/30/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Steve Mills

6/3/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Steve Mills

Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for American Water Heater Service Inc

6/3/2019: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for American Water Heater Service Inc

Initial Case Management Conference 07/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

2/20/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 07/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/20/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Pretrial Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 08/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Jury Trial 07/13/2020 09:30 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Tri Doan, Ivan Rivera, Eric Thayn, Jose Escano, Aaron Hinkle, Keith C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Civil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 06/16/2020 09:00 AM D- 302

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(*Email Notification of Settlement by PLT to Dept. 302 on 06/09/20*) Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Tri Doan, Ivan Rivera, Eric Thayn, Jose Escano, Aaron Hinkle, Keith Cul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for American Water Heater Service Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for Steve Mills

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/01/2019 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tri Doan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOUTRIS, BASIL J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWES, BRIAN E.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS WILLIAM F.