This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/18/2020 at 03:31:42 (UTC).

Discover Bank VS Wuest

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Wuest. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9556

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTORIA S. KOLAKOWSKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

WUEST, GUILLERMO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

JORDAN, CARINA M.

BENZINGER, ANDREQ E.

 

Court Documents

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

5/6/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

Case Management Statement of Discover Bank Filed

2/28/2020: Case Management Statement of Discover Bank Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Guillermo Wuest Filed

2/18/2020: Case Management Statement of Guillermo Wuest Filed

Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

1/17/2020: Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

1/21/2020: Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2020 02:30 PM D- 512

1/23/2020: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2020 02:30 PM D- 512

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Guillermo Wuest Filed

12/26/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Guillermo Wuest Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

12/16/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/16/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

12/2/2019: Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Guillermo Wuest

12/13/2019: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Guillermo Wuest

Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

11/7/2019: Not Found or Non Service Return Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/16/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Complaint - Collections Filed

10/16/2019: Complaint - Collections Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Discover Bank

10/16/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Discover Bank

Statement of Venue Filed

10/16/2019: Statement of Venue Filed

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • HearingLocation: Dept 512; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 09/24/2020 09:00 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Victoria S. Kolakowski; Department: Dept 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 06/04/2020 09:30 AM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Discover Bank Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Guillermo Wuest Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 03/04/2020 02:30 PM D- 512

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Guillermo Wuest Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/04/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial To Complaint Filed for Guillermo Wuest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNot Found or Non Service Return Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Venue Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Discover Bank

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.