This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 12:35:19 (UTC).

Diaz VS World of Jeans & Tops Inc

Case Summary

On 09/11/2020 Diaz filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against World of Jeans Tops Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3996

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIAZ , JANNET

Defendants

WORLD OF JEANS & TOPS INC

TILLY'S INC

JOHNSON , JOEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KOULLOUKIAN, NAZO

MCCORTNEY, RYAN D

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/1/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

1/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/18/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 02/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

9/21/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 02/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

6/15/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Permit Filing of First Amended PAGA Representati

5/27/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Permit Filing of First Amended PAGA Representati

Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

6/8/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Answer to Complaint Filed for World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc

3/19/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc

Notice of Errata Re: Defendant's Answer to Complaint Filed

12/16/2020: Notice of Errata Re: Defendant's Answer to Complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Jannet Diaz Filed

1/28/2021: Case Management Statement of Jannet Diaz Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

1/28/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Case Management Statement of World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc Filed

1/29/2021: Case Management Statement of World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc Filed

Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

11/16/2020: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc

11/16/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc

Proof of Service on Complaint As to World of Jeans & Tops Inc Filed

10/22/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to World of Jeans & Tops Inc Filed

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Compliance Hearing 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 09/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Permit Filing of First Amended PAGA Representati

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata Re: Defendant's Answer to Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for World of Jeans & Tops Inc , Tilly's Inc

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case(s) Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Tilly's Inc Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to World of Jeans & Tops Inc Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 02/18/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jannet Diaz

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Wrongful Termination Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORLD OF JEANS TOPS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TILLYS INC AKA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCCORTNEY RYAN D. ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KOULLOUKIAN NAZO LEON