This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 04:50:42 (UTC).

Diablo Plumbing, Inc. VS Dettaglio Construction, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 Diablo Plumbing, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dettaglio Construction, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. MARKMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9811

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

DIABLO PLUMBING, INC.

Defendants

HOLLIS STREET PARTNERS, LLC

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

DETTAGLIO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

DETTAGLIO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MCCARTHY, KEVIN P.

HOLLAND, STEVEN N.

STEIN, DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/13/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

5/18/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Order Amended Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

5/12/2020: Order Amended Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Informal Discovery Conference Declaration Filed

2/3/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Declaration Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/5/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/27/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/16/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Diablo Plumbing, Inc.

11/20/2019: Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed for Diablo Plumbing, Inc.

Case Management Statement of Hollis Street Partners, LLC Filed

11/26/2019: Case Management Statement of Hollis Street Partners, LLC Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

10/18/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

Cross-Complaint Filed for Dettaglio Construction, Inc.

10/18/2019: Cross-Complaint Filed for Dettaglio Construction, Inc.

Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

10/18/2019: Summons on Cross Complaint Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed

8/29/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/5/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/2/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Diablo Plumbing, Inc.

8/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Diablo Plumbing, Inc.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 08/04/2021 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 07/06/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 07/30/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Diablo Plumbing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Suretec Insurance Company, Hollis Street Partners, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Diablo Plumbing, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Amended Trial Setting Order and Notice of Jury Trial Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint Filed for Dettaglio Construction, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Suretec Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Dettaglio Construction, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/16/2019 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Diablo Plumbing, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIABLO PLUMBING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DETTAGLIO CONSTRUCTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, DAVID A.