This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/03/2021 at 04:19:14 (UTC).

Dependable Highway Express VS ITS Logistics, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 Dependable Highway Express filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ITS Logistics, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0734

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPENDABLE HIGHWAY EXPRESS

Defendants

ITS LOGISTICS, LLC

EMPLOYBRIDGE HOLDING COMPANY

EMPLOYBRIDGE MIDWEST 3, INC.

SPECTRA 360

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

MONTELEONE, ANNA JOY

HORN, CHARLES H.

LLOYD, PRISCILLA W

JONES, NICOLE L

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Tentative Case Management Order

2/5/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

3/5/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

Case Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

1/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

Notice of Settlement Filed for Dependable Highway Express

2/16/2021: Notice of Settlement Filed for Dependable Highway Express

Compliance Hearing 05/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

3/1/2021: Compliance Hearing 05/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

Case Management Statement of Spectra 360 Filed

1/19/2021: Case Management Statement of Spectra 360 Filed

Case Management Statement of Spectra 360 Filed

2/14/2020: Case Management Statement of Spectra 360 Filed

Case Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

2/18/2020: Case Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/2/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/2/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

9/24/2019: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Employbridge Holding Company, Employbridg

10/24/2019: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Employbridge Holding Company, Employbridg

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Spectra 360 Filed

11/5/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Spectra 360 Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Spectra 360

12/11/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Spectra 360

Case Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

12/23/2019: Case Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

Case Management Statement of Spectra 360 Filed

12/23/2019: Case Management Statement of Spectra 360 Filed

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 05/19/2021 02:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 517 date: 04/19/2021 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 517 date: 04/09/2021 time: 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 03/09/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement Filed for Dependable Highway Express

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Dependable Highway Express Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for ITS Logistics, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Third-party claim Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to ITS Logistics, LLC Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/18/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Dependable Highway Express

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EMPLOYBRIDGE MIDWEST 3, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LAB HOLDING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SPECTRA COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYBRIDGE HOLDING COMPANY is a litigant