This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 09:07:03 (UTC).

Department of Industrial Rela VS American Furntiure Rentals,

Case Summary

On 05/21/2019 Department of Industrial Rela filed an Other lawsuit against American Furntiure Rentals,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0015

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT OF INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS

Defendant

AMERICAN FURNTIURE RENTALS,INC. AND IT'S SUCCESSORS

 

Court Documents

Civil Penalties Assessment Filed

5/21/2019: Civil Penalties Assessment Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Department of Industrial Relations

5/21/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Department of Industrial Relations

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

7/1/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Department of Industrial Relations

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Penalties Assessment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less