Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/18/2021 at 00:40:41 (UTC).

Department of Fair Employment VS Vasona Management, INC, a C

Case Summary

On 10/16/2020 Department of Fair Employment filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Vasona Management, INC, a C. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRAD SELIGMAN, WINIFRED Y. SMITH and NOL WISE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8727

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

BRAD SELIGMAN

WINIFRED Y. SMITH

NOL WISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING

Defendants

284 TYRELLA LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MISSION PARK GILROY, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

ADELAIDE PINES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CATALINA CREST, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED COMPANY

THE PENTHOUSE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WHITMAN, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BROOKVALE CHATEAU, LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

CONCORD PROPS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LOGAN PARK BAY APTS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LORENZO LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

BLOSSOM VILLAGE, LLC

CARMEL HOUSE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GLEN OAKS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

VASONA MANAGEMENT, INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WINDY HILL PROPERTY VENTURES LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MAAS COMMONS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NORTHGATE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

MAAS CRESTVIEW LIMITED PARTNERS,A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

HIDDEN LAKE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

CHAYES, ADAM

SHANAGHER, DENIS F.

ARIAS, CATHY L

MARCHANT, WILLIAM L.

ROSSI, SHARON

CRISTOL-DEMAN, LIZAA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/10/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

3/29/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 05/05/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Tentative Case Management Order

3/16/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/12/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/12/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference 01/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

11/6/2020: Case Management Conference 01/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Motion for Joinder Taken Under Submission

5/24/2021: Motion for Joinder Taken Under Submission

Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) - Motion Rescheduled

6/14/2021: Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) - Motion Rescheduled

Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Taken Under Submission

5/13/2021: Motion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Taken Under Submission

Motion for Joinder Taken Under Submission

5/13/2021: Motion for Joinder Taken Under Submission

Motion to Intervene Taken Under Submission

5/13/2021: Motion to Intervene Taken Under Submission

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Intevene Filed

4/30/2021: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition Motion to Intevene Filed

Reply to Opposition to Motion to Intervene Filed

5/6/2021: Reply to Opposition to Motion to Intervene Filed

Amended Declaration of Annie Y. Pan in Support of Motion to Intervene Filed

4/16/2021: Amended Declaration of Annie Y. Pan in Support of Motion to Intervene Filed

Proof of Service on Amended Motion Filed

4/16/2021: Proof of Service on Amended Motion Filed

Amendment to Complaint and Order Filed

1/6/2021: Amendment to Complaint and Order Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Logan Park Bay Apts, LLC, a California Limited Liability Compan

12/10/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Logan Park Bay Apts, LLC, a California Limited Liability Compan

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Catalina Crest, LLC a California Limited Company Filed

12/10/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Catalina Crest, LLC a California Limited Company Filed

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Motion to Intervene

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Demurrer to Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketMotion for Change of Venue (Out of County) Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion to Intervene; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Demurrer to Complaint; Judge: Nol Wise; Department: Dept 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 24 date: 07/22/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Intervene - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketHearing Continued to Civil Law and Motion dept: 24 date: 07/22/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer to Complaint - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
147 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint - Civil Rights; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Complex Determination Hearing dept: 23 date: 02/09/2021 time: 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights - Motion Rescheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 01/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 12/08/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Civil Rights Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Department of Fair Employment and Housing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LORENZO LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PENTHOUSE LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Whitman 881 - II LLC is a litigant