Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/25/2020 at 05:16:50 (UTC).

DeHilario VS Mike Brown Electric Co.

Case Summary

On 09/04/2019 DeHilario filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Mike Brown Electric Co. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL M. MARKMAN and DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3642

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEHILARIO, YIBRAN

Defendants

MIKE BROWN ELECTRIC CO.

VALDOVINOSTAPIA, ALEJANDRO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

VANDERWALDE, PAUL D.

YOSHIMURA, FRANCES H.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/7/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Continued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/24/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/21/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

9/24/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Stipulation to Private Mediation Filed

9/14/2020: Stipulation to Private Mediation Filed

Case Management Statement of Yibran DeHilario Filed

9/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Yibran DeHilario Filed

Case Management Statement of Mike Brown Electric Co. , Alejandro Valdovinostapia Filed

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement of Mike Brown Electric Co. , Alejandro Valdovinostapia Filed

Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 514

7/9/2020: Hearing Reset to Civil Jury Trial 04/23/2021 09:00 AM D- 514

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

5/1/2020: Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/22/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/22/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/22/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Mike Brown Electric Co. , Alejandro Valdovinostapia

11/12/2019: Answer to Complaint Filed for Mike Brown Electric Co. , Alejandro Valdovinostapia

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

9/4/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing Continued to Case Management Conf Continuance dept: 514 date: 10/07/2020 time: 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketReferred to Private Mediation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Yibran DeHilario Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Mike Brown Electric Co. , Alejandro Valdovinostapia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Yibran DeHilario

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MIKE BROWN ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul D. VanDerwalde

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOSHIMURA, FRANCES H.