Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 02:09:54 (UTC).

DeGregorio VS Cordis Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/15/2019 DeGregorio filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Cordis Corporation. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9089

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEGREGORIO, JENNIFER

GEORGE, SUSAN

BRAMLAGE, ROBERT

NELSON-NEAL, DAWNIQUE

ALSTON, NIA

MCIVER, LACEY

NEWHOUSE, GLORIA

LOCKLAIR, MICHAEL

DEGREGORIO, RONALD

SMITH, RANDALL JAY

ROBINSON, TOMMY WAYNE

LEYH, JOHN CHRISTIAN

MCCOMBE, GLENDA GAIL

ROBINSON, LISA FRANKLIN

MCCOMBE, JOHN

BLACKBURN, LYDIA

BARSE, ROBERT MARSHALL

WALKER, RANDA GAIL

SMITH, CAROLYN LOUISE

Defendant

CORDIS CORPORATION

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LOPEZ, RAMON ROSSI

LOPEZ, MATTHEW RAMON

 

Court Documents

Second Amended Complaint Filed

11/12/2020: Second Amended Complaint Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:01 PM D- 23

10/15/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:01 PM D- 23

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

12/18/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

11/21/2019: Order to Relate/Reassign Case(s) Filed

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/19/2019: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Granted

11/19/2019: Motion Granted

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/20/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

First Amended Complaint Filed

11/1/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

11/1/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cordis Corporation Filed

11/6/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Cordis Corporation Filed

Case Management Conference 01/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

10/16/2019: Case Management Conference 01/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

10/15/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jennifer DeGregorio

10/15/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jennifer DeGregorio

Complaint - Product Liability Filed

10/15/2019: Complaint - Product Liability Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 05/04/2021 03:02 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 04/06/2021 03:01 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSecond Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 12/04/2020 09:16 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/10/2020 03:01 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 11/04/2020 09:01 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 09/11/2020 10:31 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 08/21/2020 10:31 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conference 07/01/2020 10:31 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Cordis Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 01/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 11/19/2019 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Product Liability Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Jennifer DeGregorio

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CORDIS CORPORATION, a Johnson & Johnson Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ, MATTHEW RAMON