This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/28/2021 at 13:37:33 (UTC).

Davis VS Sheppard Investments

Case Summary

On 02/06/2020 Davis filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Sheppard Investments. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD SEABOLT. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3535

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD SEABOLT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS, STEPHANIE

Defendants

PENSCO TRUST COMPANY, LLC

M. SHEPPARD & ASSOCIATES 401K PROFIT SHARING PLAN AS TO UNDIVIDED $124,000\$504,000

SHEPPARD , MARYELLEN

SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PROVENCHER, DOUGLAS B.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

11/13/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

1/8/2021: Rejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

Motion for Court to Issue and Enter Recordable Form of Order to Expunge Filed by Sheppard Investment

10/14/2020: Motion for Court to Issue and Enter Recordable Form of Order to Expunge Filed by Sheppard Investment

Case Management Statement of Stephanie Davis Filed

8/12/2020: Case Management Statement of Stephanie Davis Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

8/17/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Notice of Entry of Order Filed

7/28/2020: Notice of Entry of Order Filed

Case Management Statement of Sheppard Investments , M. Sheppard & Associates 401K Profit Sharing pla

7/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Sheppard Investments , M. Sheppard & Associates 401K Profit Sharing pla

Proposed Order Received

7/30/2020: Proposed Order Received

Release of Funds Issued and Filed

6/26/2020: Release of Funds Issued and Filed

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

4/27/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Order Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order DENIED Filed

4/28/2020: Order Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order DENIED Filed

Objection to Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Injunctive Relief Filed

3/10/2020: Objection to Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Injunctive Relief Filed

Notice of of Limited Scope Representation Filed

3/4/2020: Notice of of Limited Scope Representation Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

2/6/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

2/6/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/6/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Miscellaneous

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRejection Letter Issued on Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Richard Seabolt; Department: Dept 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMotion for Court to Issue and Enter Recordable Form of Order to Expunge Hearing Dropped from dept: 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 03/17/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Expunging Notice of Pending Action Recorded March 9, 2020 at 2020056569 Official Records of Al

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketOSC re Preliminary Injunction Reservation Set for dept: 511 date: 02/07/2020 time: 09:15 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Stephanie Davis Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Stephanie Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stephanie Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where PENSCO TRUST COMPANY is a litigant