This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 07/13/2020 at 14:14:00 (UTC).

Davis VS Sheppard Investments

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Davis filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Sheppard Investments. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL M. MARKMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9780

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DAVIS , STEPHANIE

DAVIS, STEPHANIE

Defendants

SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS

CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS

SHEPPARD, MARYELLEN

FCI LENDER SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SHAPERO, SARAH E

MELLEN, MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Leonard Jones in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Relief Filed

1/29/2020: Declaration of Leonard Jones in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Relief Filed

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

2/6/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

2/14/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Notice of of Related Case Filed

3/6/2020: Notice of of Related Case Filed

Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction - Dropped

12/9/2019: Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction - Dropped

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

12/11/2019: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

Proof of Service by Mail re Dismissal Filed

12/10/2019: Proof of Service by Mail re Dismissal Filed

Compliance Hearing 02/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

12/6/2019: Compliance Hearing 02/03/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

Opposition to Mtn for Preliminary Injunction Filed

12/3/2019: Opposition to Mtn for Preliminary Injunction Filed

Objection to Declaration of Stephanie Davis ISO TRO Filed

12/3/2019: Objection to Declaration of Stephanie Davis ISO TRO Filed

Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed for Plaintiff

11/25/2019: Motion for Preliminary Injunction Filed for Plaintiff

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sheppard Investments Filed

11/26/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Sheppard Investments Filed

Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Issued

11/19/2019: Order to Show Cause re Preliminary Injunction Issued

Substitution of Attorney Filed for Stephanie Davis

11/18/2019: Substitution of Attorney Filed for Stephanie Davis

First Amended Complaint Filed

11/18/2019: First Amended Complaint Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

11/18/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

10/21/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stephanie Davis

10/18/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stephanie Davis

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of of Related Case Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction; Judge: Michael M. Markman; Department: Dept 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Temporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration (Supplemental) of Stephanie Davis in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Relief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Leonard Jones in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Relief Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Stephanie Davis Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Stephanie Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for Stephanie Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketHearing Reset to Civil Ex-Parte 11/19/2019 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Reservation Set for dept: 16 date: 11/20/2019 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order & OSC re Preliminary Injunction Reservation Set for dept: 16 date: 10/29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 03/02/2020 09:00 AM D- 16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Stephanie Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEPPARD INVESTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA TD SPECIALISTS is a litigant

Latest cases where FCI LENDER SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPERO, SARAH E