This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/14/2022 at 07:48:22 (UTC).

Davis VS Driftwood Hayward Operating Company

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Driftwood Hayward Operating Company. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5325

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Defendants

BLACK AND WHITE CORPORATION

BLACK AND WHITE PARTNERSHIPS

JOHN DOES OR JANE DOES

KENDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATIING, LLC

KINDRED HEALTHCARE, LLC

MARINER HEALTH CARE, INC.

THC- ORANGE COUNTY, LLC

Driftwood Hayward Holding Company GP, LLC

Driftwood Hayward Operating Company, LP

GC Holding Co 2, LLC

GC Operating Company

GranCare LLC

Johnson Okere

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

REZA TORKZADEH

Steven Eric Weinberger

 

Court Documents

Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

7/21/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 521

Case Management Order

06/06/2022: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

06/06/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

05/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/19/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

04/28/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

04/28/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

04/20/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)

04/20/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)

Order re: Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement

04/20/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement)

04/20/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement)

Notice Notice of Association of Counsel

04/14/2022: Notice Notice of Association of Counsel

Order re: Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement

03/16/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement)

03/16/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Seal Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement)

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

03/16/2022: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement (CCP 877.6)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)

03/16/2022: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement ...)

Notice NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

03/17/2022: Notice NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

03/09/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 20; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: **; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketMessage: ** Filing Date changed from 07/15/2021 to 07/15/2021; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Robert Davis (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- REZA TORKZADEH (Attorney):Organization Name changed from The Torkzadeh Law Firm to TorkLawName Suffix: blankMiddle Name: blank; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- THC- Orange County, LLC (Defendant):Organization Name changed from THC- Orange COunty, LLC to THC- Orange County, LLC; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Mariner Health Care Management Company (Defendant):Organization Name changed from Mariner Health Care Management to Mariner Health Care Management Company; Category: Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/28/2022 at 02:30 PM in Hayward Hall of Justice at Department 521; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons Issued and Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: First Amended Complaint Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of of Appearance Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 11/29/2021 02:30 PM D- 521; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Robert Davis; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GC Holding Co 2, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GRANCARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BLACK & WHITE LIQUOR is a litigant