This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/04/2021 at 03:26:05 (UTC).

Davila VS Hayward Sisters Hospital

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 Davila filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Hayward Sisters Hospital. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRAD SELIGMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4747

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

BRAD SELIGMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVILA , JOSELUIS

Defendant

HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LEE, LARRY W.

MORONEY, LINDA M

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/28/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/14/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/14/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/27/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/27/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

3/9/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

9/8/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

7/13/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

3/2/2021: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Hayward Sisters Hospital

11/19/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Hayward Sisters Hospital

Joint Case Management Statement Filed

11/25/2020: Joint Case Management Statement Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Filed

11/12/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Filed

Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/3/2020: Complex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

Motion Granted

11/3/2020: Motion Granted

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

11/4/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 23; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/14/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Brad Seligman; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 09/28/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Case Management Statement Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Hayward Sisters Hospital Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 12/04/2020 09:15 AM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketComplex Determination Hearing 11/03/2020 03:00 PM D- 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joseluis Davila

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other Employment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAYWARD SISTERS HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moroney, Linda Moin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE, LARRY W