This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 06:02:25 (UTC).

Dana VS Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC

Case Summary

On 08/05/2020 Dana filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0325

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CLARK, GREG

DANA, URIEL

Defendant

BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

DUBROVSKY, ANNA

KANIEWSKI, JOHN A

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/16/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/16/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Tentative Case Management Order

9/9/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

4/15/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/15/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/18/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

8/13/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

8/30/2021: Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

9/2/2021: Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

Notice of Change of Address Filed

5/20/2021: Notice of Change of Address Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC Filed

3/1/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC Filed

Case Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC Filed

3/23/2021: Case Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC Filed

Answer to Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC

3/23/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC

Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

3/25/2021: Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

12/29/2020: Case Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

8/5/2020: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Uriel Dana

8/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Uriel Dana

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

8/5/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 303; Action: Settlement Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 517; Action: Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial 10/03/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPretrial Conference 09/23/2022 08:30 AM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference 08/23/2022 09:00 AM D- 303

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 07/25/2022 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Berkeley Bowl Produce, INC Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Uriel Dana, Greg Clark Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 04/15/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 12/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Uriel Dana

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BERKELEY BOWL PRODUCE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUBROVSKY, ANNA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KANIEWSKI JOHN ANTHONY