This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2022 at 21:11:03 (UTC).

DAMRON vs ALBAY CONSTRUCTION CO., et al.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 DAMRON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALBAY CONSTRUCTION CO ,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1433

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Albay Construction Co.

Armstrong International, Inc.

BW/IP, Inc.

Bank of America, National Association

Bird Corporation

Chevron U.S.A., Inc.

Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.

Consolidated Insulation, Inc.

Dillingham Construction, N.A., Inc.

Douglass Insulation Company, Inc.

FDCC California, Inc.

FMC Corporation

Familian Corporation

Ferguson Enterprises LLC

Flowserve US, Inc.

Fluor Corporation

Foster Wheeler LLC

Grinnell LLC

Henry Company LLC

IMO Industries, Inc.

29 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/08/2022: Complaint

Summons on Complaint

11/08/2022: Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/08/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/08/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment

11/15/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 18 - Hon. Richard Seabolt; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Jo-Lynne Lee in Department 18 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: Mollie Damron (Plaintiff) As to: Albay Construction Co. (Defendant); Armstrong International, Inc. (Defendant); Bank of America, National Association (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: Mollie Damron (Plaintiff) As to: Albay Construction Co. (Defendant); Armstrong International, Inc. (Defendant); Bank of America, National Association (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: Mollie Damron (Plaintiff) As to: Albay Construction Co. (Defendant); Armstrong International, Inc. (Defendant); Bank of America, National Association (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less