Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/11/2021 at 08:23:52 (UTC).

Cypress Insurance Company VS Tayor

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Cypress Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Tayor. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9075

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CYPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

TAYLOR, BETTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SCHOECK, MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

2/16/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Betty Taylor

2/16/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Betty Taylor

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/16/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 07/02/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

2/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/02/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/23/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 17; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/02/2021 09:00 AM D- 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Betty Taylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cypress Insurance Company, As Administered By Berkshire Hathaway Homes is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHOECK MICHAEL D