Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/10/2021 at 00:29:04 (UTC).

Cross VS Miguel

Case Summary

On 03/25/2019 Cross filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Miguel. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2143

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Hayward Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSS, KENNETH

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MIGUEL, CINDY SAN

MIGUEL, RICHARD SAN

PETERSENDEAN ROOFING & SOLAR

D R HORTON INC

HOMESITE SERVICES INC

JAMES PETERSON INDUSTRIES, INC.

D R HORTON, INC

D.R. HORTON CA3, INC.

D.R. HORTON BAY, INC.

PETERSEN-DEAN, INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

D.R. HORTON CA3, INC.

D.R. HORTON BAY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ANDERSON, NICHOLAS

CALEO, PAUL

HILLIER, ERIC R

MILIONIS, GEORGE K

MALTZ, ROBERT M.

LACOUNT, DANIEL

MEYER JR., RAYMOND

 

Court Documents

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

1/19/2021: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Petersen-Dean, Inc

6/19/2020: Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Petersen-Dean, Inc

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

11/6/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Case Management Statement of Petersen-Dean, Inc Filed

12/5/2019: Case Management Statement of Petersen-Dean, Inc Filed

Case Management Statement of Kenneth Cross Filed

12/6/2019: Case Management Statement of Kenneth Cross Filed

Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Homesite Services Inc Filed

8/23/2019: Proof of Service on Cross-Complaint As to Homesite Services Inc Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

7/23/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

6/12/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

5/16/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Granted

Cross-Complaint Summons Issued Filed

5/30/2019: Cross-Complaint Summons Issued Filed

Notice of Lien of Lien Claimant Filed

4/22/2019: Notice of Lien of Lien Claimant Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to D R Horton Inc Filed

5/7/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to D R Horton Inc Filed

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Amendment to Complaint RE: DOE 2

5/13/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Amendment to Complaint RE: DOE 2

Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Amendment to Complaint re: DOE 1

5/13/2019: Request Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Amendment to Complaint re: DOE 1

Summons Issued and Filed

3/27/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

3/25/2019: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Defendants and Cross-Complainants D. R. Horton CA3, Inc. And D. R. Horton Bay, Inc.'s

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Homesite Services Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of D.R. Horton Bay, Inc., D.R. Horton CA3, Inc. Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Richard San Miguel Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Kenneth Cross Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Summary Judgment; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Motion for Summary Adjudication; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProposed Order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Summary Judgment - Dropped

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Homesite Services Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to D R Horton Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien of Lien Claimant Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Amended Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/08/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Kenneth Cross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JAMES PETERSEN INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PETERSENDEAN ROOFING AND SOLAR SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PETERSEN-DEAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where D R HORTON INC is a litigant