This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/25/2020 at 02:51:38 (UTC).

Crofton VS Crystal Image Farms

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Crofton filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Crystal Image Farms. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7236

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROFTON, TIMOTHY

Defendants

CRYSTAL IMAGE FARMS

BORGES, DENIZE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRUEN, JAN A.

HERSH, NANCY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement of Denize Borges Filed

9/15/2020: Case Management Statement of Denize Borges Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Timothy Crofton Filed

9/17/2020: Case Management Statement of Timothy Crofton Filed

Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

9/17/2020: Notice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

Notice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

9/18/2020: Notice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

Proof of Service by Mail of Case management order Filed

7/27/2020: Proof of Service by Mail of Case management order Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/7/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Denize Borges, Crystal Image Farms

2/24/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Denize Borges, Crystal Image Farms

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

2/4/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Notice of Errata to the Complaint Filed

2/7/2020: Notice of Errata to the Complaint Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Crystal Image Farms Filed

1/30/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Crystal Image Farms Filed

Notice of Errata Filed

12/31/2019: Notice of Errata Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 04/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 6

12/18/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 04/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 6

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

12/18/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/17/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Timothy Crofton

12/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Timothy Crofton

Complaint Fraud Filed

12/17/2019: Complaint Fraud Filed

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 6; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Continued Case Management Conference Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Timothy Crofton Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 02/17/2021 03:00 PM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Denize Borges Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Case management order Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketHearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 09/23/2020 03:00 PM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Denize Borges, Crystal Image Farms

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata to the Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Crystal Image Farms Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Errata Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 04/30/2020 03:00 PM D- 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Timothy Crofton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less