This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/27/2021 at 03:46:30 (UTC).

Cribbs VS Cribbs

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Cribbs filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Cribbs. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1976

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRIBBS, A.ZANE

Defendants

CRIBBS, ALANZA Z.

EAST BAY REGIONAL PARK DISTRICT

WELLS FARGO BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

RUBKE, MARK E.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney Filed for A.Zane Cribbs

8/4/2021: Substitution of Attorney Filed for A.Zane Cribbs

Initial Case Management Conference 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

6/17/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

6/17/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

6/14/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for A.Zane Cribbs

6/14/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for A.Zane Cribbs

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

6/14/2021: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney Filed for A.Zane Cribbs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 10/27/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for A.Zane Cribbs

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST BAY REGIONAL PARK DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUBKE, MARK E.