This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/11/2023 at 06:11:06 (UTC).

CRAWFORD vs ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC., et al.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2022 CRAWFORD filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC ,. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Richard Seabolt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6867

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Richard Seabolt

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC.

ATWOOD & MORRILL AS VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC.

CARRIER CORPORATION

CATERPILLAR, INC.

CROWN CORK & SEAL COMPANY, INC.

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL, LLC

FLOWSERVE US, INC.

FMC CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

GOULDS PUMPS, LLC

GREENE, TWEED & CO., INC.

GRINNELL LLC

HOLLINGSWORTH & VOSE COMPANY

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.

HOPEMAN BROTHERS, INC.

IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.

INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY

ITT CORPORATION

MORSE TEC LLC

27 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

03/08/2023: Request for Dismissal

Answer to First Amended Complaint

02/27/2023: Answer to First Amended Complaint

Answer

03/07/2023: Answer

Tentative Case Management Order

03/09/2023: Tentative Case Management Order

Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

03/07/2023: Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Amended Complaint

02/22/2023: Amended Complaint

Case Management Statement

02/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

02/23/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

02/22/2023: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint

02/17/2023: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...)

02/17/2023: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amen...)

Reply PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

02/09/2023: Reply PLAINTIFFS REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT

Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

01/13/2023: Order re: Initial Case Management Conference

Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

01/13/2023: Minute Order (Initial Case Management Conference)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

01/13/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

01/13/2023: Miscellaneous - Other (Name Extension) INDEX OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

01/13/2023: Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

01/13/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketMessage: Tentative Ruling Published for 03/10/2023 9:00 AM Case Management Conference}; Category: Tentative Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer Filed by: MORSE TEC LLC (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE Filed and Received by: Designated Defense Counsel (Defendant) As to: Designated Defense Counsel (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMessage: Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: William H. Crawford (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: Designated Defense Counsel (Defendant); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by: Jody Mae White (Plaintiff); Kevin Crawford (Plaintiff); Nena Ruth Thompson (Plaintiff); William Troy Crawford (Plaintiff); William Sean Crawford (Plaintiff) As to: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); ATWOOD & MORRILL AS VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC. (Defendant); CARRIER CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: William H. Crawford (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMessage: Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 10:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 02/17/2023 Result Type to Held - Motion Granted; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER ASBESTOS Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order DESIGNATING CASE COMPLEX Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case assigned to Hon. Jo-Lynne Lee in Department 18 Rene C. Davidson Courthouse; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Payment of Advanced Jury Fee Filed by: William H. Crawford (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/13/2023 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: The case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type; Category: Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed by: William H. Crawford (Plaintiff) As to: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); ATWOOD & MORRILL AS VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC. (Defendant); CARRIER CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by: William H. Crawford (Plaintiff) As to: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); ATWOOD & MORRILL AS VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC. (Defendant); CARRIER CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Filed by: William H. Crawford (Plaintiff) As to: ARMSTRONG INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Defendant); ATWOOD & MORRILL AS VALVES AND CONTROLS US, INC. (Defendant); CARRIER CORPORATION (Defendant) et al.; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less