Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 01:36:27 (UTC).

County of Alameda VS Scott

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 County of Alameda filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0733

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

SCOTT , DANA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZIEGLER, DONNA R.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To Dana Scott

1/29/2021: Stipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To Dana Scott

Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

9/28/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Default Judgment

9/1/2020: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

9/1/2020: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

Case Management Statement of County of Alameda Filed

9/8/2020: Case Management Statement of County of Alameda Filed

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered

9/14/2020: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered

Judgment Entered

9/14/2020: Judgment Entered

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dana Scott Filed

6/25/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Dana Scott Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Dana Scott Filed

7/30/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Dana Scott Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 09/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

5/14/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 09/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/14/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

5/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for County of Alameda

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for County of Alameda

Complaint Fraud Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Fraud Filed

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketOrder Setting Aside Default Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Order Re: Set Aside Default As To Dana Scott

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMotion to Vacate/Set Aside Default and Default Judgment Reservation Set for dept: 24 date: 03/11/202

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDefault Court Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of County of Alameda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Default Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Dana Scott Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Dana Scott Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Dana Scott Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/23/2020 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for County of Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIEGLER, DONNA R.