This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 10/21/2020 at 23:18:43 (UTC).

County of Alameda VS Jackson

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 County of Alameda filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against Jackson. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8774

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

Defendant

JACKSON, PORSHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZIEGLER, DONNA R.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

8/6/2020: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

Case Management Statement of County of Alameda Filed

4/27/2020: Case Management Statement of County of Alameda Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/28/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Complaint Fraud Filed

12/31/2019: Complaint Fraud Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for County of Alameda

12/31/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for County of Alameda

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/31/2019: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 05/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

1/2/2020: Initial Case Management Conference 05/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/2/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 08/19/2020 01:30 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of County of Alameda Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/14/2020 03:00 PM D- 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for County of Alameda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Fraud Filed

    Read MoreRead Less