This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 03:51:03 (UTC).

Coronado VS American Honda Motor Co, Inc

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Coronado filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against American Honda Motor Co, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JO-LYNNE Q. LEE, MICHAEL M. MARKMAN, RICHARD SEABOLT and ROBERT MCGUINESS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******7581

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JO-LYNNE Q. LEE

MICHAEL M. MARKMAN

RICHARD SEABOLT

ROBERT MCGUINESS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORONADO, LETICIA

CORONADO, JOE A.

Defendants

KELLY MOORE PAINT COMPANY, INC

AUTOMATIVE EXCHANGE SERVICE INC

AMERICAN HONDA MOTOR CO, INC

HONDA R&D AMERICAS, INC

HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION

NISSAN BRAKE OHIO, INC

AKEBONO BRAKE CORPORATION

DCO LLC

BORGWARNER MORSE TEC LLC

HONDA OF AMERICA MFG, INC

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC

BASCO DRYWALL & PAINTING CO

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

HENNESSY INDUSTRIES, LLC

AUTOMOTIVE EXCHANGE SERVICE INC

MORSE TEC LLC

Others

COUNSEL, DESIGNATED DEFENSE

DESIGNATED DEFENSE COUNSEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SATTERLEY ESQ, JOSEPH D

HARTLEY, EDWARD E.

WILLIAMSON, IAN G

ZAPALA, ALAN J

FOUNTAIN, BILL D.

BRYDON, JOHN R.

SPANOS, EVANTHIA M

OBERG, LISA L.

HUGO, EDWARD R.

ONGARO, DAVID R

OLSON, DEAN A.

VANDAM, TINA BROCCARDO

MILANFAR, SHAHRAD

CUATTO, EMILY V

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/16/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/16/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

10/14/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/6/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/4/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/4/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/4/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

8/26/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

8/30/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Motion in Limine #2 Filed

11/10/2020: Motion in Limine #2 Filed

Proposed Order Received

11/12/2020: Proposed Order Received

Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Brief ISO of Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed

11/30/2020: Opposition to Defendants' Supplemental Brief ISO of Motion in Limine No. 1 Filed

Objection and Counter-Designation to Testimony Filed

11/19/2020: Objection and Counter-Designation to Testimony Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

11/19/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Proof of Service by Mail MIL Nos 1 to 5 Filed

11/16/2020: Proof of Service by Mail MIL Nos 1 to 5 Filed

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition MSA Filed

10/16/2020: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition MSA Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

10/9/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Answer to Complaint Filed for Akebono Brake Corporation

2/14/2020: Answer to Complaint Filed for Akebono Brake Corporation

549 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 18; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of American Honda Motor Co, Inc, Honda Trading America Corporation, Honda

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Joe A. Coronado, Leticia Coronado Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 07/16/2021 10:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Joe A. Coronado, Leticia Coronado Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion for Sanctions 01/13/2021 08:30 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion for Sanctions 01/13/2021 08:30 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketHearing Vacated: Motion for Sanctions 01/13/2021 08:30 AM D- 521

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDER SEAL Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
747 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail of Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Honda Trading America Corporation Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to American Honda Motor Co, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Kelly Moore Paint Company, Inc Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference 01/31/2020 09:00 AM D- 18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Fees Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplex Designation Requested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Asbestos Filed (Amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Joe A. Coronado

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HONDA TRADING AMERICA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOMOTIVE EXCHANGE SERVICE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HONDA OF AMERICA MFG, INC is a litigant