Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 04:29:27 (UTC).

Cormier- Grade VS Equity Residential Services, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/17/2021 Cormier- Grade filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Equity Residential Services, LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******9039

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORMIER- GRADE, LISA

Defendants

TISHMAN SPEYER ARCHSTONE SMITH HACIENDA LLC

EQUITY RESIDENTIAL SERVICES, LLC

TRUTNER, LISA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

SUDANO, BRIAN D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

2/17/2021: Complaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Cormier- Grade

2/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Cormier- Grade

Notice of Posting Jury Filed

2/17/2021: Notice of Posting Jury Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

2/22/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 07/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

2/23/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 07/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/23/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 24; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 07/07/2021 09:00 AM D- 24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Posting Jury Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Lisa Cormier- Grade

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Other PI/PD/WD Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TISHMAN SPEYER ARCHSTONE SMITH HACIENDA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EQUITY RESIDENTIAL SERVICES L.L.C. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUDANO, BRIAN D.