Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 08:29:29 (UTC).

Corbins VS Francoeur

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Corbins filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Francoeur. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5045

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CORBINS , CHARLENE

CORBINS , BERNARD

Defendants

FRANCOEUR, MASON L.

HERTZ CORPORATION

HERTZ VEHICLE, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KHAWAJA, SALIM

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

4/9/2021: Complaint - Auto Tort Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernard Corbins

4/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernard Corbins

Summons Issued and Filed

4/9/2021: Summons Issued and Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 08/23/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

4/14/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/23/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

4/14/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 518; Action: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 08/23/2021 02:30 PM D- 518

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Bernard Corbins

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HERTZ VEHICLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHAWAJA, SALIM