This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 10:54:34 (UTC).

Cook VS Calaveras Asbestos, LTD

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 Cook filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Calaveras Asbestos, LTD. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jo-Lynne Lee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8251

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jo-Lynne Lee

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laurel Cook

William Cook

Defendants

CALAVERAS ASBESTOS, LTD

SIERRA PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION

CENTRAL VALLEY SUPPLY CO

VUKICH & SON INC

POLAR TANKERS, INC

CERTAINTEED CORPORATION

KEENAN PROPERTIES, INC

THE DARCOID COMPANY OF CALIFONIA

MS2G, INC

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC

P.E. O'HAIR & CO.

WESTBURNE SUPPLY, INC

Not Yet Classified

Designated Defense Counsel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

David L. Amell

Edward R. Hugo

Gary D. Sharp

Kenneth B. Prindle

Lisa L. Oberg

Mark A Love

Robert L. Nelder, Esq

W. Joseph Gunter

 

Court Documents

Notice of Notice of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

9/24/2021: Notice of Notice of Entry of Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/17/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/17/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/3/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/21/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

4/30/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/26/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/26/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

2/22/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

05/20/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

05/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

05/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

General Order (Case Management Order)

05/10/2022: General Order (Case Management Order)

Case Management Statement

05/05/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

05/04/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

02/10/2022: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

02/04/2022: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Case Management Statement

01/20/2022: Case Management Statement

319 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/20/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18 updated: Result Date to 05/20/2022 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2022 at 09:00 AM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 18; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 05/12/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 301 Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion was rescheduled to 10/04/2022 09:00 AM at Department 302; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: General Order (Case Management Order) Entered by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: William Cook (Plaintiff); Laurel Cook (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order Filed by: William Cook (Plaintiff); Laurel Cook (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Pre-Trial Settlement Conference scheduled for 10/04/2022 at 09:00 AM in George E. McDonald Hall of Justice at Department 302; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: NOTE: (*MSC set for May 12, 2022 in Dept. 301 at 9:00AM via BlueJeans Video Conference); Category: Case Note

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: William Cook (Plaintiff); Laurel Cook (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
224 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Peremptory Challenge as to Brad Seligman Filed for Keenan Properties, Inc - 170.6; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Demand for Jury Trial Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Keenan Properties, Inc; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMessage: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conference 09/13/2019 09:15 AM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 09/10/2019 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Plaintiff's Deman for Jury and Posting of Advanced Jury Fees Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Cook; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less