This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 09:48:02 (UTC).

Consumer Portfolio Services INC, a California corpor VS Neal

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Consumer Portfolio Services INC, a California corpor filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Neal. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3825

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

NEAL, DAMARCUS D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WILLIAMS, SHANNON C.

 

Court Documents

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Damarcus D. Neal Filed

1/26/2021: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Damarcus D. Neal Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Damarcus D. Neal Filed

1/12/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Damarcus D. Neal Filed

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/11/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Consumer Portfolio Services INC, a California corporation

12/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Consumer Portfolio Services INC, a California corporation

Complaint - Collections Filed

12/11/2020: Complaint - Collections Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Damarcus D. Neal Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Damarcus D. Neal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Damarcus D. Neal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Consumer Portfolio Services INC, a California corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Collections Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, SHANNON C