Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/12/2020 at 18:23:57 (UTC).

Conservatorship of: WILLIAM MILTON ADAMS

Case Summary

On 02/15/2001 Conservatorship of WILLIAM MILTON ADAMS was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARSHALL I. WHITLEY and CHARLES TRIAY,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4000

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

MARSHALL I. WHITLEY

CHARLES TRIAY,

 

Party Details

Petitioners

KRETZ, LINDA L

PUBLIC GUARDIAN-CONSERVATOR, COUNTY OF ALAMEDA

WIGGINS, CHARLENE ADAMS

Conservatee

ADAMS, WILLIAM MILTON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

WINNIE, RICHARD

PRESHER, DANIEL A.

 

Court Documents

Probate Examiner's Check List Sale of RP 12-15-03 Filed

12/12/2003: Probate Examiner's Check List Sale of RP 12-15-03 Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List Filed

1/26/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List for ex parte petn for exclusive listing Filed

6/25/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List for ex parte petn for exclusive listing Filed

Probate Examiner's Check List for 1st acct on 8/5/04 Filed

8/4/2004: Probate Examiner's Check List for 1st acct on 8/5/04 Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2005
  • DocketDeclaration Final Discharge Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Approval of Accounting; Judge: Marshall I. Whitley; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Approval of Accounting; Judge: Marshall I. Whitley; Department: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DocketOrder Settling Supplemental Final Account and Report of Conservator Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DocketOrder Settling Second and Final Account and Report of Conservator Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2005
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • DocketTentative Pregrant - SUPPLEMENTAL FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2005
  • DocketTentative Pregrant - 2ND & FINAL ACCOUNT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2005
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Returned with Proof of Service Filed for Public Guardian-Conservator, County of Al

    Read MoreRead Less
135 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2001
  • DocketDepartment: Dept 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • DocketProbate 05/10/2001 09:30 AM D-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • DocketMatter Continued for Hearing RE PERM APPT TEMP LETTERS EXTENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2001
  • DocketProbate Commenced and Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • DocketOrder Appointing LINDA KRET (TEMP) C'TOR OF THE PERSON & EST; EXP. 4-12-01 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • DocketLetters of Conservatorship (TEMP) OF THE PERSON & EST; EXP. 4/12/01 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator OF THE PERSON & EST (TEMP) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Petition FILED. 4/12/01, 9:30, D-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • DocketProbate 04/12/2001 09:30 AM D-23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2001
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator OF THE PERSON & EST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRESHER, DANIEL A.