This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 06/30/2022 at 23:37:52 (UTC).

Conservatorship of Linda Rose Bork

Case Summary

On 10/27/2021 Conservatorship of Linda Rose Bork was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUBEN SUNDEEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6193

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

RUBEN SUNDEEN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GARCIA, DELIA D.

Conservatee

BORK, LINDA ROSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GOINS II, VERNON C.

WOODS ESQ, BRENDON D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDismissal Court Ordered Without Prejudice Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinutes: Review; Judge: Ruben Sundeen; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketConservatorship Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketProposed Order Received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Petition for Temporary Conservatorship - Person; Judge: Ruben Sundeen; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Other Ex Parte; Judge: Ruben Sundeen; Department: Dept 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProbate 01/05/2022 03:30 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketPetition for Temporary Conservatorship - Person Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketProbate Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte 11/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed for Delia D. Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte 11/04/2021 03:00 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPetition for Temporary Conservatorship - Person Filed by Delia D. Garcia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketConfidential Conservator Screening Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information Form Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCapacity Declaration - Conservatorship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketProbate 04/07/2022 01:30 PM D- 201

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Probate Conservator of Person Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOINS II, VERNON C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOODS ESQ, BRENDON D.