This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 22:56:58 (UTC).

Connary VS S.C. Johnson & Son, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2020 Connary filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against S C Johnson Son, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DELBERT C. GEE and HON. Brad Seligman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1675

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

DELBERT C. GEE

HON. Brad Seligman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRECILLAS, PAUL

CONNARY, DONNA

ANDRY, ADRIENNE

PAWLUK-FLORIO, ZORIANA

MORAN, MICHELLE

Adrienne Andry

Michelle Moran

Paul Torrecillas

Zoriana Pawluk-Florio

Petitioner

Steven Helfand

Defendant

S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC.

Not Yet Classified

1st District Court of Appeal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

LISON, WYATT A.

THERIAULT, MATTHEW

MCDOWELL, DAVID F

David F McDowell

Matthew Theriault

Wyatt A. Lison

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Electronic Mail Re: Initial Case Management Order Filed

4/9/2021: Proof of Service by Electronic Mail Re: Initial Case Management Order Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

3/11/2021: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/12/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/12/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

1/7/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Proof of Service by Electronic Mail Re: Minutes dated 10/1/20 & Case Management Order Filed

10/5/2020: Proof of Service by Electronic Mail Re: Minutes dated 10/1/20 & Case Management Order Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

10/1/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

10/1/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/28/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

04/07/2022: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed} Order to Extend Deadline to Pay Valid Claims

04/06/2022: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed} Order to Extend Deadline to Pay Valid Claims

Remittitur

03/04/2022: Remittitur

Order from DCA

03/03/2022: Order from DCA

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

02/16/2022: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Appeal filed to Court of Appeal

01/25/2022: Acknowledgment of Receipt of Notice of Appeal filed to Court of Appeal

Notice of Billing for Clerk's and/or Reporter's Transcripts

01/19/2022: Notice of Billing for Clerk's and/or Reporter's Transcripts

Notice of Billing for Clerk's and/or Reporter's Transcripts

01/19/2022: Notice of Billing for Clerk's and/or Reporter's Transcripts

Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal (APP03)

01/19/2022: Notice of Designation of Record on Appeal (APP03)

140 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketMessage: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service Issued and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed} Order to Extend Deadline to Pay Valid Claims: Result: Granted Result Date: 04/06/2022; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed} Order to Extend Deadline to Pay Valid Claims: Status changed from Filed and Received to Signed and Filed; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketMessage: Stipulation and Order Stipulation and [Proposed} Order to Extend Deadline to Pay Valid Claims Filed and Received by: Donna Connary (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Remittitur: Exact Name: Remittitur As To Parties: removed; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketMessage: Remittitur (Name Extension) Filed by: Clerk Disposition Type: Dismissed; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Order from DCA: As To Parties: removed; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMessage: Updated -- Order from DCA: As To Parties: removed; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketMessage: Order from DCA Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketMessage: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued Issued and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    Read MoreRead Less
112 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMessage: Declaration in Support Matthew T.Theriault; Category: DCL020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMessage: Motion to Intervene Hearing Confirmed for 08/04/2020 03:00 PM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketMessage: Motion to Intervene Filed for Plaintiff; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Donna Connary, Zoriana Pawluk-Florio, Adrienne Andry, Paul Torr; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Related Case(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 10/01/2020 03:00 PM D- 514; Category: ScheduleHearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Donna Connary; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice Filed; Category: Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where S.C. JOHNSON & SON, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LISON, WYATT A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THERIAULT MATTHEW THOMAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDOWELL, DAVID F