Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 04/18/2021 at 07:00:56 (UTC).

Compton VS City of Oakland

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Compton filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against City of Oakland. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES REILLY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3479

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES REILLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Appellants

COMPTON, BYRON

COMPTON, BRYON

Plaintiff, Debtor / Appellee, Cross Defendant and Appellant

COMPTON, BRYON

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

OLIVER, TOMMY

CITY OF OAKLAND

Defendant, Respondent and Other

CITY OF OAKLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

STEWART, TREVA R

STEIN, CYNTHIA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

2/1/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/1/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/17/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/17/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/30/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conf Continuance 10/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

9/3/2020: Case Management Conf Continuance 10/05/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Bryon Compton Filed

12/23/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Bryon Compton Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

11/18/2020: Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

Application Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for City of Oakland

11/5/2020: Application Re: Entry of Judgment Filed for City of Oakland

Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

9/21/2020: Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

8/19/2020: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Continued

Motion - Motion Rescheduled

8/19/2020: Motion - Motion Rescheduled

Rejection Letter Issued on Other Ex Parte

7/22/2020: Rejection Letter Issued on Other Ex Parte

Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

6/19/2020: Case Management Statement of City of Oakland Filed

Case Management Statement of Tommy Oliver Filed

6/16/2020: Case Management Statement of Tommy Oliver Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed

2/21/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tommy Oliver Filed

2/21/2020: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tommy Oliver Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

2/7/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Complaint - Auto Tort

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 25; Action: Pretrial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: Dept 301; Action: Settlement Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: James Reilly; Department: Dept 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDesignation of Clerk's Transcript on Appeal Filed by Bryon Compton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Default on Appeal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse Cross-Complaint For Property Damage And Loss Of Use Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for Tommy Oliver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Tommy Oliver Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to City of Oakland Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 06/22/2020 09:00 AM D- 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees As to Byron Compton Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Waive Court Fees Filed for Byron Compton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Byron Compton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint - Auto Tort Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEIN, CYNTHIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEWART, TREVA R