Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 02:03:34 (UTC).

Columbia Community Association VS Langston

Case Summary

On 05/11/2020 Columbia Community Association filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Langston. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DELBERT C. GEE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1373

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

DELBERT C. GEE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLUMBIA COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendants

LANGSTON, WAYNE D.

LANGSTON, NANCY SEFRANKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

KAO, MARIA

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/3/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

1/29/2021: Tentative Case Management Order

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/29/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Tentative Case Management Order

9/24/2020: Tentative Case Management Order

Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

2/3/2021: Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

2/1/2021: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - of Laura Moreno

8/19/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - of Laura Moreno

Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff

8/19/2020: Request for Judicial Notice Filed for Plaintiff

Case Management Statement of Columbia Community Association Filed

9/15/2020: Case Management Statement of Columbia Community Association Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Nancy Sefranka Langston Filed

7/21/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Nancy Sefranka Langston Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Wayne D. Langston Filed

7/21/2020: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Wayne D. Langston Filed

Proof of Service Certificate of Compliance Notice of Case Management conference and Order, Notice of

6/23/2020: Proof of Service Certificate of Compliance Notice of Case Management conference and Order, Notice of

Proof of Service Filed

6/23/2020: Proof of Service Filed

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

5/11/2020: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Columbia Community Association

5/11/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Columbia Community Association

Certificate Of Compliance Filed

5/11/2020: Certificate Of Compliance Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

5/20/2020: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingLocation: Dept 514; Action: Compliance Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketMinutes: Compliance Hearing; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 06/07/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Delbert C. Gee; Department: Dept 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 02/03/2021 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Wayne D. Langston Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Nancy Sefranka Langston Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service Certificate of Compliance Notice of Case Management conference and Order, Notice of

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 09/29/2020 03:00 PM D- 514

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate Of Compliance Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Columbia Community Association

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAO, MARIA