This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/22/2022 at 17:30:02 (UTC).

Collectibles Management Resources, A General Part VS Verbeck

Case Summary

On 05/02/2014 Collectibles Management Resources, A General Part filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Verbeck. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Stephen Pulido. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3953

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Stephen Pulido

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

COLLECTIBLES MANAGEMENT RESOURCES, A GENERAL PARTNERSHIP

OPERATING ENGINEERS LOCAL 3 FEDERAL CREDIT UNION,

Andrew Steinheimer, Esq

Brandon L. Reeves

Christina Verbeck

Gerald Verbeck

James G. Schwartz

Stephen M. Denning

Timothy J. McCaffery

 

Court Documents

Declaration of Service by Mail

03/17/2016: Declaration of Service by Mail

Proposed Judgment Request

11/09/2015: Proposed Judgment Request

Notice of Motion Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption

02/19/2016: Notice of Motion Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption

Proposed Judgment Request

12/29/2015: Proposed Judgment Request

Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

12/29/2015: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: Does Request

Declaration Other: Request

12/29/2015: Declaration Other: Request

Declaration of Service by Mail

12/07/2015: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/24/2015: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

07/21/2015: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

05/26/2015: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

03/17/2015: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

12/16/2014: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

10/06/2014: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/16/2014: Declaration of Service by Mail

Proof of Service on Motion

09/05/2014: Proof of Service on Motion

Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

03/17/2016: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed

Claim of Exemption (Sheriff's Copy) Filed

02/23/2016: Claim of Exemption (Sheriff's Copy) Filed

Proof of Service by Mail Filed

02/29/2016: Proof of Service by Mail Filed

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketMessage: Declaration of Service by Mail; Category: DSM002

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketMessage: Claim of Exemption - Dropped; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketMessage: Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed; Category: Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketMessage: TR - Claim of Exemption - Dropped; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Bankruptcy As to Defendant Gerald Verbeck; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Default Clerk's Judgment (Money) Rejected; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • DocketMessage: Claim of Exemption (Sheriff's Copy) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Motion Notice of Hearing on Claim of Exemption; Category: NOT060

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • DocketMessage: Claim of Exemption Hearing Confirmed for 03/17/2016 03:00 PM D- 509; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketMessage: Cross-Complaint Filed for Christina Verbeck; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2014
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Christina Verbeck; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2014
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Christina Verbeck Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • DocketMessage: Court File Transfer; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 09/16/2014 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Collectibles Management Resources, A General Partnership; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2014
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Operating Engineers Local #3 Federal Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Collectibles Management Resources is a litigant