This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/08/2021 at 00:01:24 (UTC).

Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability VS Gelle

Case Summary

On 07/02/2019 Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gelle. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Hayward Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5676

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLECT ACCESS LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

GELLE, GERALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

ZEE, TAPPAN

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

12/10/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

12/10/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Statement of the Case & declaration

1/14/2021: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Statement of the Case & declaration

Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

5/7/2021: Request Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

Case Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

11/30/2020: Case Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

6/15/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

6/15/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

3/12/2020: Case Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/15/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

3/18/2020: Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/15/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

10/4/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

10/4/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

Case Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

11/4/2019: Case Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

Letter re Request for Entry of Default Filed

11/4/2019: Letter re Request for Entry of Default Filed

Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

11/4/2019: Request Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

11/14/2019: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

11/14/2019: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gerald Gelle Filed

9/3/2019: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Gerald Gelle Filed

Initial Case Management Conference 11/14/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

7/5/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 11/14/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Rejected

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Default Court Judgment (CCP 585) Filed - Statement of the Case & declaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 05/06/2021 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Order Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Gerald Gelle Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Case Management Conference; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance 12/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement of Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Gerald Gelle Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gerald Gelle Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Complaint As to Gerald Gelle Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 11/14/2019 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Collect Access LLC, a California Limited Liability Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLLECT ACCESS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEE LAW GROUP, P.C. - TAPPAN ZEE