This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 12:34:49 (UTC).

Coleman VS Edges Electrical Group LLC

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Coleman filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Edges Electrical Group LLC. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Evelio Grillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0791

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Evelio Grillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Coleman

Defendant

EDGES ELECTRICAL GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Ernest M. Malaspina

Justin F. Marquez

Sean Michael Bothamley

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

8/26/2021: Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Notice of Initial Case Management Order

11/24/2021: Notice of Initial Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/16/2021: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Notice of Case Reassignment

11/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for [Order re: Court Order]

11/09/2021: Certificate of Mailing for [Order re: Court Order]

Order re: Court Order

11/09/2021: Order re: Court Order

Minute Order (Court Order)

11/09/2021: Minute Order (Court Order)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/05/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Case Management Statement

11/08/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment

11/01/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment

Notice of Related Case

10/26/2021: Notice of Related Case

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

10/26/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment)

10/19/2021: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment)

Answer

10/20/2021: Answer

Proof of Service on Complaint As to Edges Electrical Group LLC Filed

09/22/2021: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Edges Electrical Group LLC Filed

Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

08/26/2021: Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

08/25/2021: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Initial Case Management Order Filed by: William Coleman (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/16/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/16/2021; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case reassigned to Rene C. Davidson Courthouse in Department 21 - Hon. Evelio GrilloReason: Challenge / Recusal, by Defendant; Category: Assignment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Case Reassignment Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by: William Coleman (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Order re: Court Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Court Order); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketMessage: Certificate of Mailing for [Order re: Court Order] Issued by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Statement Filed by: William Coleman (Plaintiff); Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketMessage: On the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion - Other Complaint - Other Employment scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 23 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/19/2021 01:30 PM; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketMessage: TR - Complaint - Other Employment - Motion Rescheduled; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Edges Electrical Group LLC Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 11/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Determination Hearing 10/12/2021 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Coleman; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint - Other Employment Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less