This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 05:29:17 (UTC).

Cole VS. John Crane Inc

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Cole filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against John Crane Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. Jo-Lynne Lee. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4191

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. Jo-Lynne Lee

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

FOSTER WHEELER LLC

SCOTT TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

GRINNELL LLC

J. T. THORPE & SON, INC.

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

PACIFIC GAS AND ELECTRIC COMPANY

CHEVRON SHIPPING COMPANY LLC

CONSOLIDATED INSULATION, INC.

VIC HUBBARD SPEED AND MARNE CORPORATION

A.W. CHESTERTON COMPANY

ASBESTOS CORPORATION LIMITED

MARCONI PLASTERING COMPANY, INC.

DOUGLASS INSULATION COMPANY, INC.

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

3M COMPANY

OSCAR E. ERICKSON, INC.

JOHN CRANE INC.

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.

71 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

10/11/2019: Separate Statement

Proposed Order

10/11/2019: Proposed Order

Declaration in Opposition

10/11/2019: Declaration in Opposition

Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

10/07/2019: Separate Statement of Undisputed Facts

Declaration in Support of Carrie S Lin

10/07/2019: Declaration in Support of Carrie S Lin

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

10/07/2019: Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support

Exhibit Trail Exhibit List

10/04/2019: Exhibit Trail Exhibit List

Declaration in Opposition Mirna J. Scheffy To Plaintiffs Motion in Limine RE: Examination of Expert...

10/04/2019: Declaration in Opposition Mirna J. Scheffy To Plaintiffs Motion in Limine RE: Examination of Expert...

Declaration in Opposition of Mirna J. Scheffy To Plaintiffs Motion in Limine To Preclude All References..

10/04/2019: Declaration in Opposition of Mirna J. Scheffy To Plaintiffs Motion in Limine To Preclude All References..

Proposed Order

10/02/2019: Proposed Order

Declaration of Service by Mail

10/02/2019: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

10/02/2019: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration in Support

10/02/2019: Declaration in Support

Proposed Order

10/02/2019: Proposed Order

Proposed Order Application|

10/01/2019: Proposed Order Application|

Declaration in Support

09/30/2019: Declaration in Support

Objections to Evidence

09/27/2019: Objections to Evidence

Declaration in Support Application|of Emily E Anselmo

09/27/2019: Declaration in Support Application|of Emily E Anselmo

1,053 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: General Electric Company Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party General Electric Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: Asbestos Corporation Limited Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Asbestos Corporation Limited Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: Riley Power, Inc. Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Riley Power, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Dismissal As to Defendant: Consolidated Insulation, Inc. Entered; Category: Ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketMessage: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - partial as to: party Consolidated Insulation, Inc. Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
707 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Lamons Gasket Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Answer to Complaint Filed for Exxon Mobil Corporation; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service by Mail on Notice of Case Mangement Conference Hearing Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketMessage: Amendment to Complaint substituting True name(s) for Doe(s) Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Hearing Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference 03/05/2019 03:00 PM D- 23; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complex Designation Requested; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for William Cole; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Asbestos Filed (Amended); Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less