This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 15:12:43 (UTC).

CMC Steel Fabricators, INC VS Southwest Concrete Structures

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 CMC Steel Fabricators, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Southwest Concrete Structures. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4259

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC

Defendants

RAD BUILD LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

SOUTHWEST CONCRETE STRUCTURES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TELEGRAPH 2 NEUN OWNER, LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

600 MINNESOTA STREET LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

NAUTILUS GROUP INC, A MERGED-OUT CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

GRUBER, AARON R.

STALEY, ROBERT H.

GINN, DAVID W.

PICOZZI, EDWARD M

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed

3/17/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference and Order Filed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

2/22/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Initial Case Management Conference 05/05/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

1/11/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 05/05/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

8/30/2021: Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff CMC Steel Fabricators, INC

8/9/2021: Notice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff CMC Steel Fabricators, INC

Compliance Hearing 01/18/2022 02:00 PM D- 520

8/12/2021: Compliance Hearing 01/18/2022 02:00 PM D- 520

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party RAD Build LLC, a California limited liabi

7/22/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party RAD Build LLC, a California limited liabi

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California lim

7/22/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California lim

Proof of Service by Mail Re: request for Dismissal Filed

7/22/2021: Proof of Service by Mail Re: request for Dismissal Filed

Order Trial Setting Order for Court Trial Filed

4/26/2021: Order Trial Setting Order for Court Trial Filed

General Denial To Complaint Filed for Southwest Concrete Structures INC, a California corporation

4/19/2021: General Denial To Complaint Filed for Southwest Concrete Structures INC, a California corporation

Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Telegraph 2 Neun Owner, LLC a Delaware li

1/26/2021: Request Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Telegraph 2 Neun Owner, LLC a Delaware li

Answer to Complaint Filed for Nautilus Group INC, a merged-out California corporation, RAD Build LLC

3/29/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for Nautilus Group INC, a merged-out California corporation, RAD Build LLC

Answer to Complaint Filed for 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California limited partnership

2/16/2021: Answer to Complaint Filed for 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California limited partnership

Notice of Recordination of Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

1/19/2021: Notice of Recordination of Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

1/11/2021: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

12/18/2020: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CMC Steel Fabricators, INC

12/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CMC Steel Fabricators, INC

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCompliance Hearing 01/18/2022 02:00 PM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conf Continuance Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 08/24/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Pre-Trial Settlement Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 302 date: 09/21/2021 time: 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Court Trial Hearing Dropped from dept: 520 date: 10/15/2021 time: 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Conditional Settlement (CRC 3.1385) As to Plaintiff CMC Steel Fabricators, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail Re: request for Dismissal Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California limited partnership Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California lim

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 10/15/2021 10:00 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint Filed for 600 Minnesota Street LP, a California limited partnership

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDismissal As to Defendant: Telegraph 2 Neun Owner, LLC a Delaware limited liability company Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Dismissal w/o prejudice - partial as to: party Telegraph 2 Neun Owner, LLC a Delaware li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Recordination of Notice of Pendency of Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 05/05/2021 09:30 AM D- 520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons on Complaint Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for CMC Steel Fabricators, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CMC STEEL FABRICATORS, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where 600 MINNESOTA STREET LP, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST CONCRETE STRUCTURES INC, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant