This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 13:27:11 (UTC).

Clear Blue Energy Corp VS ABI Services, Inc

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 Clear Blue Energy Corp filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABI Services, Inc. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is HON. James Reilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8703

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

HON. James Reilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAR BLUE ENERGY CORP

Defendants

ABI SERVICES, INC

A BRIGHT IDEA SERVICE, INC

THE WESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY

SURETEC INSURANCE COMPANY

NAVIGATOR'S INSURANCE COMPANY

PLATTE RIVER INSURANE COMPANY

Aaron Torres

Mark William Spahn

Vickie L. Dault

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

David L. Price

Elmira Howard

Mark D. Holmes, Esq

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference Order Issued

9/7/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

7/6/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

5/20/2021: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/20/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Case Management Conference Order Issued

5/28/2021: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

5/6/2021: Hearing Reset to Initial Case Management Conference 05/20/2021 09:00 AM D- 25

Initial Case Management Conference 08/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

2/25/2021: Initial Case Management Conference 08/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 20

Proof of Personal Service

02/10/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

02/07/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Order

11/18/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

11/18/2021: Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration of Service by Mail

09/07/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

Declaration of Service by Mail

07/06/2021: Declaration of Service by Mail

76 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Clear Blue Energy Corp (Plaintiff) As to: Platte River Insurane Company (Defendant) Service Date: 02/03/2022 Service Cost: 108.90 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Clear Blue Energy Corp (Plaintiff) As to: Navigator's Insurance Company (Defendant) Service Date: 02/01/2022 Service Cost: 58.90 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/18/2021 at 03:00 PM in Rene C. Davidson Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 11/18/2021 Result Type to Held; Category: Event

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Case Management Order Signed and Filed by: Clerk; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketMessage: Minute Order (Case Management Conference); Category: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Clear Blue Energy Corp (Plaintiff) As to: ABI Services, Inc (Defendant); ABI Services, Inc (Defendant) Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Clear Blue Energy Corp (Plaintiff) As to: ABI Services, Inc (Defendant); ABI Services, Inc (Defendant) Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Clear Blue Energy Corp (Plaintiff) As to: Suretec Insurance Company (Defendant) Service Date: 11/07/2021 Service Cost: 39.00 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Personal Service Filed by: Clear Blue Energy Corp (Plaintiff) As to: The Western Insurance Company (Defendant) Service Date: 11/07/2021 Service Cost: 59.90 Service Cost Waived: No; Category: Document

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketMessage: Answer to 1st Amended Complaint Filed for A Bright Idea Service, Inc, Mark William Spahn, Vickie L.; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Mark William Spahn Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to A Bright Idea Service, Inc Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to ABI Services, Inc Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to ABI Services, Inc Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketMessage: Proof of Service on Complaint As to Suretec Insurance Company Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketMessage: Initial Case Management Conference 08/25/2021 03:00 PM D- 20; Category: ScheduleHearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed; Category: Issue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Clear Blue Energy Corp; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMessage: Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed; Category: Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less