This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/14/2020 at 17:25:17 (UTC).

Claros VS Helm

Case Summary

On 11/25/2009 Claros filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Helm. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Fremont Hall of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JULIA SPAIN and RICHARD WOOD,. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6364

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judges

JULIA SPAIN

RICHARD WOOD,

 

Party Details

Others and Plaintiffs

CLAROS, MINDY B

CLAROS, MAUROCILO O

Debtor / Appellees and Defendants

HOMEGUARD INCORPORATED

HELM, DAVID C

HELM, DANIEL

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

11/25/2009: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to David C Helm Filed

1/8/2010: Returned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to David C Helm Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/19/2010: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

2/19/2010: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Request Re: Postponement Filed for Mindy B Claros, Maurocilo O Claros

2/22/2010: Request Re: Postponement Filed for Mindy B Claros, Maurocilo O Claros

Request Re: Postponement Granted

2/23/2010: Request Re: Postponement Granted

Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/28/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

2/24/2010: Hearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/28/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

4/28/2010: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

5/28/2010: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

5/28/2010: Stipulation for Judge Pro Tempore Filed

Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

5/28/2010: Claim of Plaintiff Taken Under Submission

Miscellaneous Residential Purchase Agreement Filed

6/1/2010: Miscellaneous Residential Purchase Agreement Filed

Judgment Entered

6/21/2010: Judgment Entered

Appeal of SC Judgment Filed

6/28/2010: Appeal of SC Judgment Filed

Small Claims Appeal 07/30/2010 09:45 AM D- 521

6/28/2010: Small Claims Appeal 07/30/2010 09:45 AM D- 521

Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

7/30/2010: Small Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of for Defendant Filed

7/30/2010: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of for Defendant Filed

Judgment Entered

7/30/2010: Judgment Entered

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Full Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketMinutes: Appeal of SC Judgment; Judge: Julia Spain; Department: Dept 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of for Defendant Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal 07/30/2010 09:45 AM D- 521

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppeal of SC Judgment Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2010
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Contested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing Reset to Small Claims Court Trial 05/28/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Postponement Filed for Mindy B Claros, Maurocilo O Claros

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Order returned unserved on Claim of Plaintiff As to David C Helm Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 03/12/2010 02:00 PM D- 603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Homeguard INC. is a litigant