This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 22:47:21 (UTC).

City of Pleasanton, City Hall VS Stanich

Case Summary

On 08/21/2001 City of Pleasanton, City Hall filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Stanich. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Gale-Schenone Hall Of Justice located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TAYLOR M. BELL, PORE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0851

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2001

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

TAYLOR M. BELL, PORE

 

Party Details

Other and Plaintiff

CITY OF PLEASANTON, CITY HALL

Defendant and Debtor / Appellee

STANICH, DAVID

 

Court Documents

Claim of Plaintiff Filed

8/21/2001: Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

9/4/2001: Proof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

9/24/2001: Small Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

9/24/2001: Judgment Entered

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

9/24/2001: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

Returned Mail: Minutes Filed

10/1/2001: Returned Mail: Minutes Filed

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Matured Installment Filed

10/16/2001: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Matured Installment Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Matured Installment Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail: Minutes Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketMinutes: Claim of Plaintiff; Judge: Taylor M. Bell, Pro Tempore; Department: Dept 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Judgment for Plaintiff - Uncontested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2001
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Valid As to David Stanich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service on Claim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2001
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial 09/24/2001 02:00 PM D- 702

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2001
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClaim of Plaintiff Filed

    Read MoreRead Less