Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alameda County Superior Courts on 09/02/2020 at 02:52:19 (UTC).

City of Oakland VS Sander

Case Summary

On 08/28/2019 City of Oakland filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Sander. This case was filed in Alameda County Superior Courts, Rene C Davidson Courthouse located in Alameda, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN PULIDO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2928

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Alameda County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rene C Davidson Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Alameda, California

Judge Details

Judge

STEPHEN PULIDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Other

CITY OF OAKLAND

Defendants and Debtor / Appellees

ALL PERSONS UNKNOWN, CLAIMING ANY LEGAL OR EQUITABLE RIGHT, TITLE, ESTATE, LIEN OR INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY DESCRIBED IN THE

HAYES, DOUGLAS T

THE TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCESSORS OF GLADYS VAN SANDER

ALL PERSONS CLAIMING BY, THROUGH OR UNDER SUCH PERSON

SANDER, GLADYS VAN

AN INDIVIDUAL AND BELIVED TO BE DECEASED;

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PARKER, BARBARA J.

 

Court Documents

Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

1/22/2020: Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

Proof of Publication As to Gladys Van Sander Filed

1/22/2020: Proof of Publication As to Gladys Van Sander Filed

Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

1/22/2020: Rejection Letter Issued on Entry of Default as to Party

Letter dated 2/6/2020 Filed

2/20/2020: Letter dated 2/6/2020 Filed

Civil Court Trial 03/04/2020 02:00 PM D- 517

2/25/2020: Civil Court Trial 03/04/2020 02:00 PM D- 517

Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

2/26/2020: Application Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

3/4/2020: Civil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

Judgment Entered

3/4/2020: Judgment Entered

Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

1/13/2020: Case Management Conference Commenced and Completed

Case Management Conference Order Issued

1/13/2020: Case Management Conference Order Issued

Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for City of Oakland - of Brian P. Mulry

10/4/2019: Application Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for City of Oakland - of Brian P. Mulry

Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

10/17/2019: Civil Ex-Parte Commenced and Completed

Initial Case Management Conference 01/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

8/30/2019: Initial Case Management Conference 01/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

8/30/2019: Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

Complaint Other Real Property Filed

8/28/2019: Complaint Other Real Property Filed

Summons Issued and Filed

8/28/2019: Summons Issued and Filed

Declaration Filed

8/28/2019: Declaration Filed

Re-Notice of Pendency of Quiet Title Complaint Filed

8/28/2019: Re-Notice of Pendency of Quiet Title Complaint Filed

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketMinutes: Complaint Other Real Property; Judge: Stephen Pulido; Department: Dept 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment Entire Action Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party As to Gladys Van Sander, the testate and intestate sucessor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial Commenced and Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Other Ex Parte Filed:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Court Trial 03/04/2020 02:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter dated 2/6/2020 Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of B. P. Mulry in support of Request to enter default Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest Re: Entry of Default as to Party Gladys Van Sander, the testate and intestate sucessors of G

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Ex-Parte 10/17/2019 02:30 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication Re: Publication of Summons and Complaint Filed for City of Oakland - of Brian P. Mulry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketPublication of Summons and Complaint Reservation Set for dept: 517 date: 10/17/2019 time: 02:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Case Management Conference 01/13/2020 03:00 PM D- 517

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRe-Notice of Pendency of Quiet Title Complaint Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed for City of Oakland

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Other Real Property Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TESTATE AND INTESTATE SUCCESSORS OF PAWLO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKER BARBARA JEAN